THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:38:13 AM
Agarwala, Vinod Kumar
CPSO#:
22023
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Lucknow, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1861 Rideau Garden Drive
Ottawa, ON K1S 1G5
Date Received: 01 Apr 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1965 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |