THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:24:55 PM
Freedman, John Judah Lionel
CPSO#:
21940
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jul 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto M5B 1W8
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5184
Fax: (416) 864-6063
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:01 Apr 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN JUDAH LIONEL FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1976 |