THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:00:38 AM
Czarnecki, Jan Stanislaw Campbell
CPSO#:
21929
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jan S. Czarnecki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
111 St Regis Cres S
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 15 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:01 Jan 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1969 |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |