THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:47:11 PM
Hands, Brian William
CPSO#:
21919
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1971
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3104 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M6A 2A1
Phone: (416) 922-0070
Fax: 416-922-0071
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patient files will be stored at the following location on or before February 28, 2023
Record Storage and Retrieval Services (RSRS)
111 St. Regis Crescent South
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Telephone: (416) 398-0638
Date Received: 21 Feb 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN WILLIAM HANDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANDS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |