THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:06:43 AM
Kristof, Francis Eugene
CPSO#:
21855
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
10 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Jan 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 24, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
By way of letter dated November 28, 2016, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario received notification from the Chief of Staff of Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital that a temporary suspension of Dr. Kristof’s privileges was implemented effective November 24, 2016.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Nov 1962 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 1969 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 25 Nov 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2004 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |