THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:25:02 AM
Roberts, Robert
CPSO#:
21784
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
500 W. Thomas rd
suite 900b
Phoenix AZ 85013
United States
Phone: (602) 5409878
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:11 South Central Avenue, Phoenix, AZ 85004
Date Received: 16 May 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Sep 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2016 |