THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:08:46 PM
Metcalfe, Brian John
CPSO#:
21783
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Peterborough Regional Health Centre, 1 Hospital Drive, Peterborough, ON K9J 7C6
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:04 Dec 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |