THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:36:29 PM
Ghaffar, Abdul
CPSO#:
21705
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Oct 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Karachi, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Great Lakes Medical Centre
25 Great Lakes Drive
Brampton ON L6R 2S5
Date Received: 01 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:27 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: May 2, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Abdul Ghaffar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 2, 2018:
Dr. Ghaffar was the subject of a College investigation into his practice. During the investigation, Dr. Ghaffar resigned his certificate of registration, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)