THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:15:35 PM
Gordon, Alan Cooper
CPSO#:
21669
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Sep 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
23-Dec-2006
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Liverpool School of Medici, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jul 1997 |