THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:22:54 PM
Ramprashad, Claudius Arthur
CPSO#:
21587
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Aug 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of West Indies, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. C. Ramprashad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 14 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Dec 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2012 |