THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 9:01:48 AM
Boodoosingh, Lal Andrew
CPSO#:
21549
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jul 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Nov 1988
Summary:
In November 1988, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Boodoosingh guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Boodoosingh's licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 1990-06-05
Hearing Date(s): 21 Nov 1988
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lal Andrew Boodoosingh to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 23, 2016.
Dr. Boodoosingh was the subject of a College investigation into allegations that he engaged in professional misconduct with respect to advising the College of a change in his practice location, and was also the subject of an assessment of his practice. As a result, Dr. Boodoosingh will resign from the College on June 1, 2016 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration
as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)