THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:46:09 PM
Lee, William Leslie
CPSO#:
21538
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of West Indies, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Sep 2013 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 18, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Lee was subject to an investigation by the College. In the face of the investigation, Dr. Lee resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.