THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:38:45 AM
Gayle, Barrington Augustus
CPSO#:
21499
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2017 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Gayle was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence. The allegations of professional misconduct are that Dr. Gayle failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional.
Dr. Gayle resigned from the College on June 7, 2017.
In the face of these allegations, Dr. Gayle acknowledged that he has no current or future intention of ever reapplying for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.