THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:35:43 AM
Khamsi, Firouz
CPSO#:
21493
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 May 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Iranian, Persian
Education: University of Birmingham, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jul 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 1971 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 07 May 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Mar 2011 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 16, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Firouz Khamsi, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
I, Dr. Firouz Khamsi:
(1) Hereby resign from the College, effective immediately.
(2) Hereby undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
(3) Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.
(4) Acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with a discipline referral of allegations, as set out in the Notice of Hearing dated April 7, 2010, that I committed an act of professional misconduct. In particular, it is alleged that I am incompetent as defined by subsection 52(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code and that I failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in my care, treatment and record-keeping for twenty-six patients, the identities of whom have been disclosed to me.
(5) Agree that, in the event that the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the investigation and prosecution of the allegations referred to at paragraph 4.