THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:03:18 AM
Wannan, Barry Winston
CPSO#:
21342
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Sep 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 229
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON P5A 1Y9
Phone: (705) 848-3673
Fax: (705) 848-3449
Electoral District: 08
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARRY WINSTON WANNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANNAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1968 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2020 |