THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 22:07:27 PM
Benoit, Paul Rodrigue
CPSO#:
21325
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Oct 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Accuro
Unit 1B
700 Industrial Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario
K1G 0Y9
Tel: (613) 738-1242
Fax: (613) 738-0562
Website: http://www.accuro.ca
Date Received: 16 Dec 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:13 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Aug 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2012 |