THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:00:01 PM
Heath, Edward Lawrence
CPSO#:
21302
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 May 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
26-May-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 May 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2014 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Dec 1995
Summary:
In December 1995, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Heath committed professional misconduct, and imposed a penalty.
On August 22, 1997, Dr. Heath's appeal to the Divisional Court was allowed and the Decision of the Discipline Committee was quashed.
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 1997-08-22
Hearing Date(s): 23 Jan 1995