THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:18:05 PM
Moonje, Vijay Badal
CPSO#:
21275
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Apr 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Nagpur University, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 01 Jul 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:14 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1962 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2021 |