THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:23:14 AM
Baunemann, Heiko
CPSO#:
21218
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
12 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
12-Feb-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:21 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Feb 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 12 Feb 2020 |