THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 12:00:35 PM
Matzko, Alexander
CPSO#:
21182
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jan 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
20-Jan-2004
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1951
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1961 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1956 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Jul 1997 |