THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:04:50 PM
Sarne, Andrew John
CPSO#:
21071
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Oct 1967
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Oct 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6-3400 Danforth Ave
Dandan Family Practice and Walk-In
Scarborough ON M1L 1E1
Phone: (416) 690 1042
Fax: (416) 693 3033
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sarne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 08 Apr 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN SARNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARNE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 1966 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Mar 1966 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 1967 |