THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 16:23:26 PM
Remus, John Leonard
CPSO#:
21061
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Oct 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: May 4, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On May 10, 2019, Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre notified the College, pursuant to s. 33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective May 4, 2019, the application by Dr. John Remus for reappointment to its medical staff was rejected by Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre.
On July 2, 2019, Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre further notified the College that effective June 26, 2019, Dr. Remus was reappointed to the medical staff and his privileges reinstated.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:27 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:15 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1961 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Jul 1962 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1962 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 1967 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 25 Sep 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 26 Feb 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: June 2, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Leonard Remus to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 2, 2020:
College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Remus engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent. In the face of the investigations, Dr. Remus resigned from the College effective July 1, 2020 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)