THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 6:07:23 AM
Williams, Anthony David
CPSO#:
20993
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
28 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Aug 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: University of London, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jun 1996 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 28 Jul 1998 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Dec 1996
Summary:
In December 1996, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Williams guilty of professional misconduct, in that he had been guilty of misconduct in a professional respect and of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner, under what became section 34(3)(c) of the Medical Act, 1970. The Committee further found Dr. Williams guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession as defined in s. 27(21); in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, as defined in s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional.
In July 1998, the Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Williams' certificate of registration to be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): Oct 10, 1995