THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:22:27 AM
Mackenzie, Victor Paul
CPSO#:
20957
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Oct 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:18 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jan 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Oct 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2012 |