THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:02:41 PM
Richards, Larry Marshall
CPSO#:
20919
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Aug 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Sep 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 1997 |