THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:28:04 PM
Maharaj, Amishanker
CPSO#:
20870
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Jul 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
The Albany Clinic
Mr. James Higginson-Rawlins
Tel: (416) 461-9471 ext. 5470
Date Received: 02 Jun 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2011 |