THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:15:13 PM
Douglas, Carol Jean
CPSO#:
20861
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jun 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Oct 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Boudreau, Carol Jean (used until: 15 Sep 1997 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Mar 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1999 |