THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:49:00 PM
De Souza, Henry Rodrigues
CPSO#:
20851
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Henry De Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 22 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:53 Chancery Circle
St Catharines, ON L2M 7R3
Date Received: 29 Sep 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Sep 2015 |