THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 11:08:53 AM
Swackhammer, Warren Byron
CPSO#:
20727
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Swackhammer, W B (used until: 23 Jul 1987 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jan 1967 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 1992 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 1992 |
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 21 Nov 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2006 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 30 Apr 1992
Summary:
On April 30, 1992, The Fitness to Practise Committee finds that Dr. Swackhammer is an incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to clause 62(1)(b) of the Health Disciplines Act.
The Fitness to Practise Committee orders the following as terms and conditions of Dr. Swackhammer s licence:
1. that he engage in the practice of medicine in association with another health care professional acceptable to the Registrar who shall monitor and file yearly reports to the College;
2. that he regularly see a physician familiar with the treatment of substance abuse acceptable to the Registrar and who shall monitor and file quarterly reports to the College;
3. that should any person who has executed an acknowledgement and undertaking for Dr. Swackhammer pursuant to the order of the Fitness to Practise Committee be unable or unwilling to continue under the terms of the acknowledgement and undertaking, Dr. Swackhammer will provide, within thirty days, a fresh acknowledgement and undertaking from a similarly qualified person who is satisfactory to the Registrar;
4. that he abstain totally from the consumption of narcotics or controlled drugs or their preparations unless prescribed by his treating physician;
5. that he not possess or prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs or their preparations. However, Dr. Swackhammer may prescribe these drugs to his patients admitted to a public hospital if the drugs are administered by someone else.
6. that if Dr. Swackhammer is unable or unwilling to comply with any provision of this order, he shall cease practising until he can once again bring himself into full compliance with the order.
A subsequent order was made by the Fitness to Practise Committee to delete the condition appearing in paragraph 5 and replace it with the following:
5. Dr. Warren B. Swackhammer is permitted to prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs or their preparations, provided that he complete the course Prescribing Narcotics and Controlled Drugs offered by the University of Toronto by December 31, 1997.
Should Dr. Swackhammer fail to complete the course as required, he shall not prescribe narcotics, or controlled drugs or their preparations.
On June 29, 2000, the Fitness to Practice Committee directed the Registrar to remove the terms, conditions and limitations imposed on Dr. Warren B. Swackhammer s Certificate of Registration by Order dated April 30, 1992 and amended by Order dated November 21, 1996.
Appeal: No Appeal