THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:14:55 AM
Longford, Ulic Dalzell Burnet Hinkson
CPSO#:
20680
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Malay
Education: University of Dublin, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 18 Jan 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 1967 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 1994 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 1994 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2012 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 29, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Ulic Dalzell Burnet Hinkson Longford to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):
I, Dr. Ulic Dalzell B.H. Longford:
(2) Acknowledge and agree that the College referred allegations of my incapacity to the Fitness to Practise Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated January 16, 2012 (the “Notice of Hearing”).
(3) Acknowledge and agree that, in exchange for an original copy of this Undertaking as executed by me, the College has agreed to withdraw the Notice of Hearing.
(4) Acknowledge that I am the subject of investigations by the College, including an investigation under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (the “Investigations”) regarding whether I have committed acts of professional misconduct or am incompetent in the practice of medicine.
(5) Acknowledge that allegations regarding acts of professional misconduct have not been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of my standard of practice.
(6) Hereby resign from the College effective June 29th, 2012 (the “Effective Date”).
(7) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(8) Agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I am in breach of this Undertaking the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the allegations regarding incapacity set out in the Notice of Hearing and/or to re-commence the Investigations it terminated as a result of this Undertaking.
(14) Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.