THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:00:34 AM
Frelick, Linden Frederick
CPSO#:
20495
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
15 Aug 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Aug 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1966 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 15 Aug 1996 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Aug 1996
Summary:
On August 15, 1996, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Frelick guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 34(3)(c) of the Medical Act, 1970, in that he had been guilty of misconduct in a professional respect or of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner or of incompetence. Dr. Frelick was also found guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 548/90, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 29(22); in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 29(30); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 29(33).
The Committee further found Dr. Frelick incompetent, as defined in s. 61(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient, of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice.
Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:
1. A reprimand, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;
2. Revocation of Dr. Frelick's certificate of registration; and
3. A fine of $5,000.00 to be paid forthwith.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 12, 1996