THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 22:09:19 PM
Albelda, Louis
CPSO#:
20410
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jul 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Spanish
Education: University of Valencia, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:28 Nov 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 1960 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 1964 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1965 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1966 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2004 |