THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:56:01 AM
Turner, George Robert
CPSO#:
19998
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1974 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1965 to 30 Jun 1966
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2010 |