THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:54:27 AM
Brubacher, Lloyd Elverne
CPSO#:
19951
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jun 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lloyd E. Brubacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:36 Heritage Dr
Ilderton ON N0M 2A0
or
Mount Hope
200 College Ave
London ON N6A 1Y1
Date Received: 14 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1973 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |