THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:58:14 AM
Posen, David
CPSO#:
19929
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jun 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 416-398-0638 Fax: 1-877-398-5932
Toll free: 1-888-563-3732
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 05 Nov 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1977 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |