THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:33:19 AM
Sloane, John Andrews
CPSO#:
19919
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 May 1972
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 May 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 309
2900 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M4N 3N8
Phone: (647) 988-7037
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN ANDREWS SLOANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLOANE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Sep 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 1972 |