THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:31:13 AM
Pflug, Michael
CPSO#:
19892
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: University of Paris, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact Records Management Ltd. Telephone: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 01 Aug 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 1960 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2023 |