THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:56:16 PM
Ramesar, Simon Carlton Leslie
CPSO#:
19792
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Oct 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Feb 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sheffield University School of Medicine, 1949
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1964 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Oct 1999 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Mar 2000
Summary:
On March 9, 2000, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Ramesar guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; in particular, obtaining marijuana from a patient and failing to make a record of appointments with a patient.
Subsequently, the Committee ordered the following penalty:
1. A reprimand, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register;
2. That the Registrar shall, if Dr. Ramesar seeks re-instatement of his certificate of registration (which he gave up upon his retirement) do the following:
a) suspend Dr. Ramesar(s certificate of registration for a period of nine months from the date the certificate of registration would otherwise become effective;
b) suspend three months of the nine-months suspension, provided Dr. Ramesar pays costs to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario fixed in the amount of $1,000 on or before July 1, 2000;
c) require Dr. Ramesar to undergo training (in a course acceptable to the Registrar) on boundary violations in psychiatric practice; and
d) require Dr. Ramesar to undergo a specialty assessment by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario within one year of resuming practice.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 06, 2000