THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 12:42:00 PM
Miller, James Edgar Buchanan
CPSO#:
19731
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1965 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Edgar Buchanan Miller to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 12, 2017:
Dr. Miller has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.