THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:30:28 AM
Meindok, Harry
CPSO#:
19613
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Jul 1965
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Estonian
Education: English Conjoint Board, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1964 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2012 |