THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:57:54 PM
Brooks, James Stewart
CPSO#:
19563
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1965
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Quest Community Health Centre
Suite 100
145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON L2R 2Z9
Phone: (905) 688-2558 Ext. 246
Fax: (905) 688-4678
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to:
P O Box 566
Virgil, ON
L0S 1T0
Date Received: 18 Jan 2011
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 3, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On Novermber 18, 2010, Niagara Health System notified the College that Dr. James Stewart Brooks's privileges were suspended, effective November 3, 2010.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES STEWART BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1965 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2017 |