Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 May 2017
Summary:
On May 1, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Arturo Sanchez committed an act of professional misconduct in that he was found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.
Dr. Sanchez was a paediatrician who had a practice in Toronto, Ontario. Dr. Sanchez is no longer a member of the College. He resigned his certificate of registration on November 16, 2015.
On December 7, 2015, Dr. Sanchez was convicted of two counts of indecent assault with respect to Patient A and one count of indecent assault with respect to Patient F. The trial Judge’s findings with respect to Patients A and F include the following:
Patient A
The trial judge found that when Patient A was 14 and 15 years old, she was hospitalized in Toronto at the Hospital for Sick Children (“HSC”) in the 1960’s. The trial judge further found that during these admissions, Dr. Sanchez touched Patient A’s breasts and vagina for a sexual purpose. The trial judge found that one night during Patient A’s second hospital admission, Dr. Sanchez came in her room during the night, got on top of her and touched her breasts and vagina. This was done for his sexual gratification and not for any medical purpose.
Patient F
When Patient F was approximately 11 years old, she was prescribed weekly allergy shots. Dr. Sanchez would come to her home to give her these shots. The trial judge found that on one of these weekly visits, Dr. Sanchez gave Patient F a hug from the back and put his hands down the front of her shirt. On another occasion, Dr. Sanchez touched Patient F’s breast for a sexual purpose.
On March 30, 2016 Dr. Sanchez was sentenced to 18 months incarceration. In imposing sentence, the trial Judge found that “the degree of responsibility attributable to the accused is at the high end of the scale – a deliberate breach of trust by a person of significant power and authority.” She found that aggravating factors included the victims’ were under 18 years of age, that the accused was in a position of trust, that the offences had considerable impact on the victims and that the assaults were persistent and lengthy, planned and deliberate and were not a
spur of the moment thing.
On May 1, 2017, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs that:
The Registrar revoke Dr. Sanchez’s certificate of effective immediately.
- Dr. Sanchez attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Sanchez pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of the date this Order becomes final.