THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:30:02 AM
Malcolmson, Samuel Alexander
CPSO#:
19513
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
11 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. Malcolmson
Tel: (416) 488-8292
Fax: (416) 413-0016
Date Received: 08 Jun 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Sep 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2009 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 11 Jun 2009 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Jun 2009
Summary:
On June 11, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Malcolmson had committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; and in that he had engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
Dr. Malcolmson was Patient A’s psychiatrist from 2001 to 2003. Beginning in approximately 2001, Dr. Malcolmson engaged in a variety of sexual acts with Patient A, including intercourse; gave Patient A gifts and money; and travelled with Patient A. The sexual acts occurred in Dr. Malcolmson’s office, among other places.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar revoke Dr. Malcolmson’s certificate of registration immediately.
2. Dr. Malcolmson appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. Malcolmson pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.
4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): June 11, 2009