THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:45:18 PM
Yamka, Edward Michael
CPSO#:
19512
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
14-May-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1965 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Nov 2012 |