THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:36:22 AM
Lewis, Arthur Franklyn
CPSO#:
19427
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jan 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Mar 1965
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
15-Dec-2005
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1962 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jan 2002 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: November 22, 2004
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective November 22, 2004, Dr. Arthur Franklyn Lewis has undertaken to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario,
-- to permanently cease to practise psychotherapy,
-- not to engage in any other form of individual treatment, psychological or otherwise,
with anyone who has not attained the age of majority,
-- not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in
any jursidiction.