THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:20:58 PM
Caverhill, John Warwick
CPSO#:
19322
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Sep 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Sep 1991 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Sep 1994
Summary:
In September 1994, Dr. Caverhill pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. Dr. Caverhill also pleaded guilty to a charge of incompetence, as defined in s. 61(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice. The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Caverhill's plea of guilty to these charges, and found him guilty of professional misconduct and incompetence. The Committee also accepted a joint submission as to penalty. Consequently, the Committee acknowledged Dr. Caverh'll(s resignation of his licence to practice, as well as his undertaking not to re-apply for a licence in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. The Committee ordered that Dr. Caverhill be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. It further ordered that on or before 30 September 1994 he provide the College with an irrevocable letter of credit in the amount of $10,000.00, which was to be in place for a period of five years from 19 September 1994, on terms acceptable to the Registrar, as security for therapy and counselling.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 19, 1994