THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:30:59 AM
Luce, Anna Louise
CPSO#:
19311
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
10 Jun 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Oct 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Sep 1965 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Apr 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 1996 |