THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:34:40 AM
Tesher, Martin Sheldon
CPSO#:
19227
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
15 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jul 1964
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1964 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2019 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 2002
Summary:
On August 12, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Tesher's plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has provided records to the College evidencing that an allegation of professional misconduct or incompetence or a similar allegation has been made against Dr. Tesher, and that he has entered into an agreement or compromise with the governing body in order to settle the matter without a finding of misconduct or incompetence or a similar finding being made which would, in the opinion of the College, be an act of professional misconduct as defined in subsection (1), or would constitute incompetence as defined in section 52 of the Health Professions Procedural Code; and he has committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
1. THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE DIRECTS the Registrar to suspend Dr. Tesher's certificate of registration for a period of three months, starting on a date to be fixed by the Registrar after conferring with Dr. Tesher.
2. The DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE ORDERS the removal of three months of the suspension if Dr. Tesher provides confirmation to the College that he has completed the courses that he was required to take in the United States and those courses are satisfactory to the College.
3. THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE REQUIRES Dr. Tesher to attend before this panel to be reprimanded.
4. THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE REQUIRES Dr. Tesher to pay part of the College(s costs to the College, fixed in the amount of $2,500.00, by August 30, 2002.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 12, 2002
Concerns
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Jurisdiction Notices
Active Date: June 12, 2019
Summary: