THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:44:49 AM
Mekdeci, Anthony Casimiro
CPSO#:
19212
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Jul 1964
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
26-Jun-2016
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Docudavit Medical Solutions
28 Eugene Street
North York, ON M6B 3Z4
Phone: 1-888-7819083
Date Received: 24 Oct 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1962 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2013 |