THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:02:18 AM
McKnight, Russel Delbert
CPSO#:
19136
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
8-Feb-2021
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1960 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Jul 1962 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1962 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Mar 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1992 |